+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 430 ILCS 65/2 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-2
- 430 ILCS 65/3 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-3
- 430 ILCS 65/6.2 new -