+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor