+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 013-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Makes FY09 appropriations to the University of Illinois. Effective July 1, 2008.