+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0843
- Effective Date July 30, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Aging Committee; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Aging Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Senior Pharmaceutical Assistance Act with provisions similar to those of House Bill 3922, but with changes that include the following: (1) provides that if a prescription drug benefit is added to the Medicare program, the Senior Pharmaceutical Assistance Review Committee shall make recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor for the realignment of State operated senior prescription drug programs (instead of providing that those programs shall be realigned) so that Illinois residents qualify for at least substantially the same (instead of at least the same) level of benefits as before implementation of the Medicare prescription drug benefit; and (2) requires the Committee to report its recommendations by January 1, 2005 (instead of within 60 days after the Medicare prescription drug benefit becomes law). Effective immediately.