+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-005-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.3 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-208.3
+ − Vote
February 16, 2022: HB3919 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor