+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in State Government
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick Welch
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans Affairs Committee; 015-000-000
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On November 18, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs' duty to reimburse veterans service organizations for services rendered by a veterans service officer is subject to appropriations.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 1, 2004: HB3918 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 01, 2004
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor