+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 016-000-000
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On October 9, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 805/3-7 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-7
+ − Vote
February 26, 2020: HB3914 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor