+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0652
- Effective Date June 18, 2014
- Governor Approved
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2014
- Second Reading
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2014
- Do Pass Local Government; 011-000-000
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D'Amico
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-000
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that the District may acquire by purchase real property in furtherance of its regional and local stormwater management activities. Eliminates a provision concerning a referendum requirement for assistance bonds. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2014: HB3912 - Third Reading - Friday, May 23, 2014
April 4, 2014: HB3912 - Third Reading - Friday, April 04, 2014
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor