+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-001-000
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On October 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 3, 2020: HB3905 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor