+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On December 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-025-003
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 009-006-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 008-006-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
On October 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019
- Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On September 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Changes the definition of "institution" to mean a publicly or privately operated college or university located in this State that offers baccalaureate degrees (rather than providing that "institution" has the meaning given to that term under the Higher Education Student Assistance Act). Provides that professional representation provided by an athlete agent to a student athlete shall be by a person licensed pursuant to the Illinois Athlete Agents Act. Effective January 1, 2023.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (3)
October 30, 2019: HB3904 - Third Reading
October 29, 2019: HB3904 - Appropriations-Higher Education
October 29, 2019: HCA0001 - Appropriations-Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor