+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 2, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0077
- Effective Date July 2, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 5, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-002
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 17, 2002 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang