+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On November 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/14-1.02 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-1.02
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor