+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 19, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0764
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 016-000-000
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On November 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2004: HB3893 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 05, 2004
March 30, 2004: HB3893 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 30, 2004
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor