+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2020
- Arrive in Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-036-000
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-007-000
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford