+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (61)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1135
- Sent to the Governor
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3
- Passed Both Houses
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Pacione-Zayas
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 072-036-001
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-018-001
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 072-036-001
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 6, 2023
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-assigned to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Waive Posting Notice
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Postponed - State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Re-assigned to State Government
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Assigned to State Government
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Housing Committee; 014-009-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-042-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Housing Committee; 014-008-000
- Assigned to Housing Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 003
Provides that the Governor shall appoint 3 members (rather than one member) to the Task Force from an organization representing Illinois county clerks and recorders (rather than Illinois clerks and recorders), including appointments from the Chicago suburbs, from a small metropolitan area, and from a rural area. Makes technical corrections in provisions about appointment of a member representing a local administering agency from a rural area to the Task Force.
Senate Amendment 001
Changes the effective date of the bill to July 1, 2023 (rather than January 1, 2022). Makes conforming changes to the date the Illinois Rental Housing Support Program Funding Allocation Task Force is required to submit its report (from March 31, 2022 to September 30, 2023) and the date the Task Force provisions are repealed (from March 31, 2023 to September 30, 2024).
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: provides that, as part of the request-for-proposal process and subject to specified requirements, best efforts will be used to prioritize local administering agencies that serve the county in which annual receipts were collected upon receipt of current data from the Department of Revenue applicable to the annual receipts (rather than annual receipts shall be distributed with priority to local administering agencies from the county in which the annual receipts were collected); removes a provision requiring the Illinois Housing Development Authority to wait at least 6 months after annual receipts are deposited into the Rental Housing Support Program Fund before distributing the annual receipts; provides that the Illinois Housing Development Authority shall use best efforts through outreach to local administering agencies to encourage at least one local administering agency to serve each county in the State (rather than the Authority shall work with each county to ensure that at least one local administering agency is located within each county); and creates the Illinois Rental Housing Support Program Funding Allocation Task Force, which shall study and make recommendations regarding the equitable distribution of rental housing support funds across the State and shall also work with the Authority as funding allocations will be required to be adjusted due to data released by the United States Census Bureau on the 2020 decennial census. Effective January 1, 2022.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 55 ILCS 5/3-5018 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-5018
- 55 ILCS 5/3-5018.1
- 55 ILCS 5/4-12002 - from Ch. 34, par. 4-12002
- 55 ILCS 5/4-12002.1
- 310 ILCS 105/10
- 310 ILCS 105/15
- 310 ILCS 105/30 new