+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 13, 2005 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino
- Motion Prevailed
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Motion Filed Rep. Frank J. Mautino; Table House Bill 3877 Pursuant to Rule 60(b)
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 012-000-000
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-3 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-3
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-7 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor