+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On August 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/26-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 26-1
- 105 ILCS 5/26-2a - from Ch. 122, par. 26-2a