+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0976
- Effective Date January 1, 2013
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2012
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2012
- Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012
- Assigned to Executive
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-026-002
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2012
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 5 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 30, 2012
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente
+ − Adopted Amendments (7)
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county or municipality, as applicable, may enter into a tax revenue sharing agreement. Defines "tax revenue sharing agreement". Sets forth requirements concerning reports. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
House Floor Amendment No. 6
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts specified information concerning tax sharing agreements in counties and municipalities from public inspection and copying. Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county or municipality, as applicable, may enter into an agreement to share or rebate any portion of retailers' occupation taxes generated by retail sales of tangible personal property. Sets forth requirements concerning reports. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
House Floor Amendment No. 6
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts specified information concerning tax sharing agreements in counties and municipalities from public inspection and copying. Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county or municipality, as applicable, may enter into an agreement to share or rebate any portion of retailers' occupation taxes generated by retail sales of tangible personal property. Sets forth requirements concerning reports. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 5 ILCS 140/2 - from Ch. 116, par. 202
- 35 ILCS 120/3 - from Ch. 120, par. 442
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1134 new -
- 65 ILCS 5/8-3-20 new -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.35 new -