+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On October 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On October 14, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 305 ILCS 5/10-16.5 -
- 735 ILCS 5/12-109 - from Ch. 110, par. 12-109
- 750 ILCS 5/504 - from Ch. 40, par. 504
- 750 ILCS 5/505 - from Ch. 40, par. 505
- 750 ILCS 16/20 -
- 750 ILCS 16/23 -
- 750 ILCS 45/20.7 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor