+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2020
- Arrive in Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2020: HB3836 - Third Reading
February 26, 2020: HB3836 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor