+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Terri Bryant
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-003-000
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-10-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-10-2