+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On December 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On November 27, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 20, 2013
On November 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
On September 27, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2013
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 105/1 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor