+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 35 ILCS 5/1501 - from Ch. 120, par. 15-1501
- 805 ILCS 180/50-10 -