+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Motion Filed Rep. Cynthia Soto; Table House Bill 382 Pursuant to Rule 60(b)
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Gary Hannig
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Dan Reitz
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor