+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 011-000-000
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 016-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Remains in Insurance Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Insurance Committee; 005-006-004
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On October 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On September 21, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke