+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Rules; 3-9(b)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Rules; 3-9(b)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2007
- Second Reading
- Do Pass Education; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2007
- Assigned to Education
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 2, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 098-008-006
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes. Provides that the gross disobedience or misconduct for which a school board may expel pupils includes that perpetuated by electronic means. Provides that the board may suspend or by regulation authorize the superintendent of the district or the principal, assistant principal, or dean of students of any school to suspend a student (now, the board may by regulation authorize the specified officials to suspend a student) for a certain period of time or may expel a student for a definite period of time if (i) that student has been determined to have made an explicit threat on an Internet web site against a school employee, a student, or any school-related personnel, (ii) the Internet web site through which the threat was made is a site that was accessible within the school at the time the threat was made or was available to third parties who worked or studied within the school grounds at the time the threat was made, or (instead of and) (iii) the threat could be reasonably interpreted as bearing a reasonable relationship to the safety and security of the threatened individual because of his or her duties or employment status or status as a student (instead of educational status) inside the school.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.6 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-22.6