+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2005
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2005
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor