+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (57)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0917
- Effective Date August 12, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 113-003-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Jacobs
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Frank C. Watson
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Insurance & Pensions; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance & Pensions
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
- Do Pass Insurance & Pensions; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs
- Assigned to Insurance & Pensions
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-007-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Pension Note Filed
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Chicago Firefighters Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Extends the deadline to establish service credit for certain service under the Chicago Municipal Article that had been previously terminated until January 1, 2005. Provides that a fireman who (1) retired on or after January 16, 2004 and on or before the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 93rd General Assembly and (2) files an application to establish service credit for that service under the Chicago Municipal Article before January 1, 2005 shall have his or her pension recalculated prospectively to include the newly established service credit. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/6-111 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-111
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -