+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- To Special Issues Subcommittee
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor