+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0710
- Effective Date July 16, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2014
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2014
- Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/14-4.01 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-4.01
- 105 ILCS 230/5-100 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2014: HB3777 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2014
March 27, 2014: HB3777 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 27, 2014
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor