+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0103
- Effective Date July 22, 2015
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015
- Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 012-000-000
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy Committee; 008-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 009-001-000
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Energy Committee
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the introduced bill with the following changes: Applies requirements to any tariff filed or contract renewed or entered into on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the early termination fee or penalty shall not exceed $50 for residential customers and $150 for small commercial retail customers (rather than $50 for all customers). Adds an immediate effective date.
House Amendment 001
Provides that any early termination fee or penalty shall not exceed $50 total for residential customers and $150 for small commercial retail customers (as introduced, any early termination fee or penalty shall not exceed $50 for any type of customer).
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 26, 2015: HB3766 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 26, 2015
May 7, 2015: HB3766 - Energy and Public Utilities - May 07, 2015
April 23, 2015: HB3766 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 23, 2015
April 20, 2015: HFA0001 - Energy - Apr 20, 2015
March 18, 2015: HB3766 - Energy - Mar 18, 2015
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor