+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0005
- Effective Date July 1, 2015
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Neil Anderson
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
- Sponsor Removed Sen. David S. Luechtefeld
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Appropriations I; 009-005-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 066-045-000
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Arrived in House
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-020-004
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Andy Manar
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-023-002
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-002-000
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-001-000
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- To Finance Subcommittee
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes FY16 appropriations to the State Board of Education and specified retirement systems. Effective July 1, 2015.
+ − Votes (7)
May 29, 2015: SFA0001 - Appropriations I - May 29, 2015
May 29, 2015: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Friday, May 29, 2015
May 29, 2015: HB3763 - Third Reading - Friday, May 29, 2015
May 6, 2015: HB3763 - Executive - May 06, 2015
April 15, 2015: HB3763 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 15, 2015
March 26, 2015: HB3763 - Finance Subcommittee - Mar 26, 2015
March 26, 2015: HB3763 - Revenue & Finance - Mar 26, 2015
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor