+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Redistricting; 006-004-000
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 20, 2011
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 6, 2011
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Redistricting
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor