+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 3, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0023
- Effective Date August 3, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 5, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2007
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 2, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 020-000-000
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert S. Molaro
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 15 ILCS 505/16.5 -
- 35 ILCS 5/203 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-203
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2007: HB0376 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 23, 2007
February 28, 2007: HB0376 - Third Reading - Wednesday, February 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor