+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 6, 2003 in the House:
- Reduction Veto Stands 93-0069
On October 23, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Reduction Veto November 4, 2003
On July 1, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Reduction Veto PA 93-0069
- Effective Date July 1, 2003
On June 20, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 038-020-001
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2003
- Do Pass Appropriations II; 012-000-000
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 16, 2003
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-030-002
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Assigned to Appropriations II
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 2-10, to May 31, 2003.
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig