+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environment and Energy Committee; 013-002-000
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy Committee
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor