+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0514
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 30, 2016
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-001
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margo McDermed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 019-000-000
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Re-Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2016
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading June 23, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015
- Arrive in Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 019-000-000
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Females, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides that except as permitted under this Act or as otherwise mandated by federal law or regulation (rather than notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary and except as otherwise mandated by federal law or regulation), those who submit bids or proposals for State construction contracts whose bids are successful but that fail to meet the goals shall be notified of that deficiency and shall be afforded a period to cure that deficiency in the bid or proposal. Extends the repeal of the Act from June 30, 2016 to June 30, 2020. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 20 ILCS 2805/11 new -
- 30 ILCS 575/4 - from Ch. 127, par. 132.604
- 30 ILCS 575/9 - from Ch. 127, par. 132.609
+ − Votes (5)
May 29, 2016: SFA0002 - Concurrence
May 25, 2016: SFA0002 - Veterans' Affairs
March 2, 2016: SFA0002 - Executive
April 14, 2015: HB3748 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 14, 2015
March 19, 2015: HB3748 - Veterans' Affairs - Mar 19, 2015
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor