+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0183
- Effective Date July 29, 2015
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015
- Do Pass Agriculture; 008-000-000
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Peter Breen
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 011-000-000
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 30 ILCS 120/17 - from Ch. 85, par. 667
- 30 ILCS 120/18 - from Ch. 85, par. 668