+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations II
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 16, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-038-001
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
- Assigned to Appropriations II
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 2-10, to May 31, 2003.
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 004-003-000
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig