+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
- Do Pass State Government; 005-002-001
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-053-000
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 18, 2017: HB3744 - State Government
April 26, 2017: HB3744 - Third Reading
March 15, 2017: HB3744 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor