+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 9, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0062
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Higher Education; 011-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-031-001
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Housing Committee; 015-008-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Housing Committee
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2021: HB0374 - Third Reading
May 4, 2021: HB0374 - Higher Education
April 15, 2021: HB0374 - Third Reading
March 10, 2021: HB0374 - Housing Committee
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor