+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 14, 2017: HB3735 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor