+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations I
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 19, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-039-000
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
- Assigned to Appropriations I
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 2-10, to May 31, 2003
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ricca Slone
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig