+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Roger L. Eddy
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2008
- Do Pass as Amended Environment and Energy; 008-000-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment and Energy
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Environment and Energy
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 23, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes a provision requiring the Illinois Commerce Commission to adopt rules to implement policies that are consistent with provisions concerning clean coal technologies by March 1, 2015.
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes a provision requiring the Illinois Commerce Commission to adopt rules to implement policies that are consistent with provisions concerning clean coal technologies by March 1, 2015.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2008: HB3733 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2008
May 18, 2007: HB3733 - Third Reading - Friday, May 18, 2007
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor