+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor