+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor