+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 11, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0303
- Effective Date August 11, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 12, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Bond
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. In a Section concerning the creation and operation of Cyber Gang Units (instead of Internet Gang Crime Units), allocates 50% of the moneys to the Cook County Sheriff's Office and 50% of the moneys to the Lake County Metropolitan Enforcement Group. Deletes provisions that include the City of Danville Police Department and the Village of Round Lake Heights Police Department in the program. Provides that the Cyber Gang Units Pilot Program terminates on July 1, 2012 (instead of 2010). Effective immediately.