+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On October 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor