+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 230 ILCS 15/7 - from Ch. 85, par. 2307
- 230 ILCS 15/8.1 - from Ch. 85, par. 2308.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor