+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/14-1.08 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-1.08
- 105 ILCS 5/14-7.02 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-7.02